+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 204
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 05/17/18
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 222
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-2
- Read second time
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
- Amended
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Shealy, Timmons
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 9
March 29, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor