+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 8, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor