+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 159
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 04/14/14
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 167
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
March 12, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor