+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
January 26, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1