+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Tallon
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Spires
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gambrell, Gagnon, Erickson, Murphy
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Henderson, Sottile
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Newton, Erickson
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Clary, Tallon, Gagnon, Gambrell
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Brannon
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor