+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 179
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 05/23/16
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 189
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
- Member request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, King
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor