+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 208
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 262
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Mitchell
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 8
May 20, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor