+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Knight
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor