+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
- Read second time
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Knight
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-24
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-1-14
- Member request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: K.R.Crawford
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, McCoy
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Whipper
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
April 2, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor