+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 257
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/06/14
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 307
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor