+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 233
- Effective date 06/03/16
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 269
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 3
May 31, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
April 14, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor