+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-58 Nays-31
- Read second time
- Amended
- Reconsidered
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-516
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Forrester, Kennedy, Hiott, Bingham, Hamilton, Funderburk, Sottile, Clary, Allison, RL Brown, Alexander, Kirby, Cole, Hicks, Crosby, Whitmire, Cobb-Hunter, Ott, King, Jefferson, Douglas, Hart, Gambrell, Gagnon, Hill, Finlay, Rhyal, Merrill
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-27-16
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Hicks
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Norman
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Stringer
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Loftis
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2016: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 6
April 27, 2016: Table Motion to Reconsider
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 24
- Absent: 6
April 27, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor