+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 172
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 05/03/18
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 185
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor