+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 231
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 265
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special order, set for May 11, 2016
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gagnon
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-7
- Amended
- Read second time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Ott, Mack, Whipper, Cobb-Hunter, Williams, Sandifer, Forrester, McKnight, Kennedy, JE Smith, King, Bernstein, Whitmire, Erickson, Anderson, Kirby, McCoy, MS McLeod,
- Member request name added as sponsor: White, Spires, R.L.Brown, Gilliard, Dillard
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Stavrinakis, Newton
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Knight, Cole, George, Horne, G.R.Smith, G.M.Smith, Williams, Limehouse, Pope, Gambrell
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hayes, Mack, Rivers, Ridgeway, Clary, Brannon, Atwater, Daning, Bannister, Anthony, McEachern, Mitchell, Erickson
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: King, Loftis
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Simrill, G.A.Brown, Bedingfield, Stringer, Ryhal
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ott, Govan, Riley, Willis, Thayer, Felder, Hicks
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Hamilton, Finlay, Huggins
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Corley
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pitts
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Sottile, Crosby, V.S.Moss, Jefferson, Yow, Duckworth, H.A.Crawford, Jordan, Fry, Herbkersman, Lowe, Goldfinch, Hixon, Norman, Hiott, Taylor, McCoy, D.C.Moss, Collins, Rutherford, Anderson, Kirby
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2016: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 7
May 17, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor