+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-32
- Read second time
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Sandifer
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-18-14
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Ott, Cobb-Hunter, Hiott, Toole, Atwater, Bedingfield, Hardwick, Hosey, RL Brown, Knight, Williams, Jefferson, JE Smith, Clemmons, Southard, Hart, Bernstein, Sabb, McEachern, Mack, Dilliard, Douglas
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.L.Ott
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Knight
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 26, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 5