+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 256
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 218
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Bedingfield, Hill, GR Smith, Loftis, McCoy, Hiott, Norman, Felder, Hixon, Hart, Pitts, Willis, Thayer, Finlay, Gagnon, MS McLeod, Cobb-Hunter, King
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: To concur
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 6
June 1, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 4
March 31, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3