+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thurs., 1-16-14
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Howard, King, Neal, Atwater, DC Moss, Clemmons, Knight, Sabb, Ott, Hart, GR Smith, Felder, Toole
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time