+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 11
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 07/01/15
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 23
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 10
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 10
March 18, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor