+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 200
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 252
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-26
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-20-14
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-15-14
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Amended
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Special order, set for April 30, 2014
- Recalled from Committee on Education
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-9
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Crosby, McCoy, Wood
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henderson
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Chumley
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hayes, George, Hart, Ott, Williams, Jefferson, Willis, Munnerlyn, Sabb, Anthony, Ridgeway, Weeks, King, Cobb-Hunter, Howard, Neal, Patrick, McEachern, Douglas, Bales, Bedingfield, Hiott, Owens, Hosey, Clyburn, GA Brown, Anderson, Branham, Wood, Brannon, Ryhal, Taylor, Wells, Hixon, Toole, GR Smith, JR Smith
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 6
May 1, 2014: To adopt Amendment number P3-2
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 1, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2014: Table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 73
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor