+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hosey
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time