+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-21
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Crosby
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Toole
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-20-17
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Govan, Brown, Whipper
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-6-17
- Requests for debate-Rep. White, Hill, Gagnon, Erickson, Ballentine, Caskey, JE Smith, Ryhal, Williams, Bennett, Crosby, Sandifer, Forester, GR Smith, Loftis, Jefferson
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (7)
April 26, 2017: Table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 97
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Adopt Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Table Motion to Commit to LCI Com.
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Table Motion to Reconsider
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Adjourn For The Day
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 81
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Adjourn For The Day
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 78
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 6
April 26, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor