+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 157
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 04/21/16
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 162
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 45
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor