+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 73
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 109
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Saluda Delegation
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Saluda Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor