+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Toole
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Sat., 2-15-14
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-5-13
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 6-4-13
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-28-13
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-30-13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-18-13
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Rutherford, RL Brown, Cobb-Hunter, Mitchell, Neal, Hart, Whipper, Gilliard, Lowe, KR Crawford, Jefferson, Williams, Hosey, Anderson, Bedingfield, Atwater, Sandifer
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time