+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor