+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 17
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 04/23/13
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 24
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor