+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 10