+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 223
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 248
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Free conference powers granted
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Free conference committee appointed Cole, Merrill, Rutherford
- Free conference report received and adopted
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Free conference powers granted
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Free conference committee appointed Rankin, Hutto, Bennett
- Free conference report adopted
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-18
- Free conference powers rejected
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Cole, Merrill, Rutherford
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
- Roll call Ayes-2 Nays-39
- Conference committee appointed Rankin, Hutto, Bennett
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
- Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-4
- Senate amendment amended
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Read second time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Bennett
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-58 Nays-48
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (12)
May 28, 2014: To grant free conference powers
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
May 28, 2014: Adopt Free Conference Report
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 6
May 28, 2014: Granting Free Conference Powers
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 6
May 28, 2014: To adopt the free conference report
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 27, 2014: To table the motion to grant free conference powers
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
May 27, 2014: To grant free conference powers
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
May 14, 2014: Adopt amdt. 2a Amendment number 2a
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 5
May 14, 2014: Adopt Amd. 1a Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 5
May 1, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2013: Adopt question 1 of divided question
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
March 20, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor