+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor