+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder, Hardee, Duckworth
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Huggins
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Quinn, Mitchell
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Kirby
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hill
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.A.Brown
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor