+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 52
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 73
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 2
March 22, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor