+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hicks, Weeks
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith, W.J.McLeod
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor