+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hicks
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks, W.J.McLeod, Whipper
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 10, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor