+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Thayer
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 17, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor