+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bales, Anthony
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 10, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 5