+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 62
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 95
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-27
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Shealy , Hutto, Senn
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-13
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. White, Bannister, McCravy, Willis, Gagnon, Loftis, Hill, Pitts, West, Yow, Thayer, Henegan, Douglas, Knight, Crosby, Hosey, Sandifer, Magnuson
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
May 11, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 6
April 5, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 5