+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McGarry
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Yow
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Caskey
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor