+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Goldfinch
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman, Newton
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Crosby, Norman
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Patrick, Lowe, Whitmire, Southard, Limehouse, McCoy, Barfield, Gagnon, Henderson, Tallon, Cole
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Lucas, Delleney, Kennedy, Huggins, Nanney, Chumley, Brannon, Erickson, Pitts, Willis, Toole, Pope, Quinn, Bingham, D.C.Moss, Clemmons, Putnam, G.R.Smith, Hamilton, V.S.Moss, Allison, Forrester
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Wood
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atwater
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hardwick, Spires, Sottile, J.R.Smith, Hixon, Simrill
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor