+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 29
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 40
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
February 6, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor