+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Continued
- Reconsidered
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-47
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-1-18
- Reconsidered
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-33 Nays-69
- Rejected
- Amended
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-20-18
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-15-18
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-24-18
- Member request name added as sponsor: Williams, Jefferson
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-11-17
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-17
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-4-17
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-27-17
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-20-17
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-6-17
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Simrill, Hiott, GM Smith, Dillard, S Rivers, Kirby, Bennett, Daning, Crosby, Whipper, Brown, Cole, Tallon, Magnuson, Forester, Robinson-Simpson, Bannister, Taylor, GR Smith, Stringer, Loftis, Burns, McEachern, Erickson, Hart, Crawford, Hewitt, Ryhal
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 8
February 27, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 2