+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 14
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 04/23/13
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 20
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-4
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-19
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2013: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
April 9, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor