+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 184
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 206
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
May 27, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor