+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 181
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 05/25/16
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 192
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
- Requests for debate-Rep. Sandifer, Hiott, Whitmire, Hill, HA Crawford, Ryhal, Hardee, Ott, Merrill, Crosby, Wells, Jefferson, Bamberg, Gambrell
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-4-16
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-22 Nays-20
- Read third time and sent to House
- Amended
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-9 Nays-31
- Motion to Set Bill for Adjourned Debate Failed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority Report Removed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Turner
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (7)
May 18, 2016: To concur
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
May 4, 2016: Divide the question-Amd.2 Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 90
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
May 4, 2016: Table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 4
May 4, 2016: Table motion to recommit
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
May 4, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
April 30, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2015: To set for Adjourned Debate
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor