+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 241
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/06/14
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 268
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- House amendment amended
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-12-14
- Reconsidered
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-16
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: S.Martin , McElveen, Young
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
June 3, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 6
May 29, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 22, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 8
May 20, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
March 21, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor