+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 236
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 241
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-0
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary
- Polled out of committee Judiciary
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 22, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 30
- Absent: 8
May 21, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
April 29, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor