+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Malloy, Bennett
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
May 7, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor