+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 274
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 05/17/18
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 229
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-6 Nays-1
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Atwater
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. GR Smith, Trantham, Loftis, Long, Chumley, Clary, Elliott, Hamilton, Sandifer, Bryant, Felder, Taylor, Blackwell, Crosby, Burns, Magnuson, Toole, Bannister, Spires, Hiott, Willis, Atwater, McEachern, Henderson
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Debate interrupted by adjournment
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-5 Nays-1
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-4 Nays-2
- Read second time
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Votes (7)
May 8, 2018: To concur
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 39
May 3, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 29
- Absent: 10
April 24, 2018: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 1
March 22, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 39
- Absent: 1
March 21, 2018: To adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 40
March 21, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 39
- Absent: 1
March 21, 2018: To appeal decision of the President
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor