+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 156
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 04/17/18
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 166
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-10-18
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Massey, McElveen, Sabb, Gambrell, Climer
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 6
March 28, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor