+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Thayer, KR Crawfor, Danning, Crosby, Lowe, Erickson, Long, Gagnon, Wood, Whipper, Chumly, Brannon, Hiott, Taylor, Wells, Norman, Barfield, Hardwick, GR Smith, Knight
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 8, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor