+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 150
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 04/21/16
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 155
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2016: To concur
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 29
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor